The Canadian Medical Association (CMA) is a national, voluntary association of physicians that advocates on behalf of its members and the public for access to high-quality health care. The CMA also provides leadership and guidance to physicians. The CMA was formed in Quebec City in 1867, just three months after the birth of Canada. It was created by 164 physicians who recognized the need for a national medical body. They selected Sir Charles Tupper, who would later serve as Canada's prime minister, as the first president. Today the CMA has more than 85,000 members, and advocates on behalf of both members and their patients — on Parliament Hill, during federal election campaigns and in the media. The CMA also takes the lead on public health issues. CMA’s Mission: Helping physicians care for patients. CMA’s Vision: The CMA will be the leader in engaging and serving physicians, and the national voice for the highest standards for health and health care.
Timothy Smith, Chief Executive Officer
Address:
1867 Alta Vista Drive
Ottawa, ON K1G 5W8
Canada
Telephone number:
613-731-8610
This is the responsible officer name as provided in the most recent registration for the corporation or organization.
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
Canadian Medical Association/Association médicale canadienne | 2024-03-01 | current |
Canadian Medical Association/Association médicale canadienne | 2008-10-07 | 2024-03-01 |
Responsible Officer Name | From (YYYY-MM-DD) | To (YYYY-MM-DD) |
---|---|---|
Timothy Smith | 2013-12-08 | Current |
Paul-Émile Cloutier | 2009-07-20 | 2013-12-08 |
Barbara Drew | 2008-10-07 | 2009-07-20 |
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Registrants are required to submit a monthly communication report for each oral and arranged communication with a designated public office holder. The name of the most senior paid officer (i.e. the registrant) will appear on all in-house monthly communication reports, whether or not he/she participated in the communication.
Note: Monthly Communication Reports are due on the 15th day of each month for communications that took place in the previous month.
Results below are sorted by posted date, beginning with the most recent.
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development Branch |
January 2018 to March 2018 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development Branch |
June 2017 to October 2017 | Not a designated office |
Junior Research and Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development Branch |
May 2014 to August 2014 | Not a designated office |
Junior Research and Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development Branch |
September 2013 to December 2013 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development Branch |
January 2018 to March 2018 | Not a designated office |
Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development Branch |
June 2017 to October 2017 | Not a designated office |
Junior Research and Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development Branch |
May 2014 to August 2014 | Not a designated office |
Junior Research and Policy Analyst
Global Affairs, Global Issues and Development Branch |
September 2013 to December 2013 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Director of Communications
Minister of Science and Sport, Minister's Office |
February 2016 to December 2018 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Research Analyst, Senior Research Analyst
Statistics Canada, Health Division |
September 1978 to October 1990 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Secretary
National Capital Commission, Surveys and Mapping |
December 1989 to August 1992 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Analyst
Department of Foreign Affairs and International Trade, U.S. Bureau |
May 1994 Footnote 3 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Special Assistant to the Secretary of State
Industry Canada, Office of the Secretary of State for Science, Research & Development |
August 1995 to November 1995 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Consultant, Medical Ethics
Canadian Armed Forces, Not applicable |
July 2003 to August 2003 | Not a designated office |
Position | Period Held | Last Date Designated Public Office Held |
---|---|---|
Policy Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Aurélien Gill, Senator |
March 2009 to May 2009 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Charlie Watt, Senator |
February 2007 to February 2009 | Not a designated office |
Policy Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Jean Lapointe, Senator |
September 2001 to May 2010 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor
Heritage Canada, Office of the Secretary of State (Multicultarism) Status of Women |
February 2000 to September 2001 | Not a designated office |
Senior Advisor
The Senate of Canada, The Honourable Pierre De Bané, Senator |
May 1999 to January 2000 | Not a designated office |